MD HB772 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Green Purchasing Committee in consultation with the Departments of the Environment, Agriculture, General Services, and other stakeholders, to develop, by January 1, 2022, a certain methodology for State agencies to estimate greenhouse gas emissions of food and beverages procured, establish a certain baseline measurement by January 1, 2023, and develop certain strategies and policy recommendations; establishing a goal to reduce certain greenhouse gas emissions by State units by 25% by fiscal year 2030; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Green Purchasing Committee – Food and Beverage Procurement – Greenhouse Gas Emissions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (105-27)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {666287/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-05HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-31HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB478 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Finance and Procurement11203(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement14410.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback