MD HB771 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each room accessible for individuals with disabilities in a lodging establishment to be furnished with a bed of at least a certain height beginning December 31, 2021; requiring 25% by December 31, 2021, 50% by December 31, 2022, 75% by December 31, 2023, and 100% beginning December 31, 2024 of accessible rooms in a lodging establishment to be furnished with a bed of a certain height; and defining the term "accessible room" as one that is in compliance with certain Americans with Disabilities Act guidelines; etc.
Title
Lodging Establishments - Accessible Rooms for Individuals With Disabilities - Bed Height
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 319 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {333892/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Motion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Disabilities
Disabled
Hotels and Motels
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Disabilities
Disabled
Hotels and Motels
Rules and Regulations
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 15 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Regulation | 15 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |