MD HB769 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing, at any point in a judicial proceeding under the Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act, the court to order either party to pay the other party an amount for the reasonable and necessary expense of prosecuting or defending the proceeding; requiring the court to consider certain issues before ordering payment under the Act; authorizing the court to make a certain award under certain circumstances; providing for a certain reimbursement; authorizing the court to make a certain order; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Award of Reasonable and Necessary Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {286882/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |