MD HB768 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 94-7)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to protect State residents and certain stakeholders from the high costs of prescription drug products; requiring the Board to collect data and identify prescription drug products that may cause affordability challenges; authorizing the Board to meet in closed session when discussing trade secrets; authorizing the Board to set an upper payment limit for certain drug products; creating a Stakeholder Council to assist the Board with certain reporting requirements; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board

Sponsors

Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Sandy Bartlett [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]
Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Andrew Cassilly [R]Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]
Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]
Del. Paul Corderman [R]Del. Brian Crosby [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. Jeff Ghrist [R]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]
Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]
Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Richard Impallaria [R]Del. Julian Ivey [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]
Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]
Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Mary Lehman [D]Del. Jazz Lewis [D]
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Lesley Lopez [D]
Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]
Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Mike Rogers [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]
Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]
Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]
Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]
Del. Courtney Watson [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Harry Bhandari [D]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-37) (Y: 96 N: 37 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-40) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {903025/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-93) (Y: 40 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-18 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {493826/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (39-95) (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (38-8)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (96-37)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSenators Feldman, Klausmeier, and Reilly
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05HouseDelegates Cullison, Pena-Melnyk, and Kipke
2019-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {887275/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-04-02SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (98-40)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFloor Amendment {903025/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (40-93)
2019-03-26HouseFloor Amendment {493826/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (39-95)
2019-03-25HouseSpecial Order until 03/26 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments {886582/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-13HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects

Advertising
Appeals
Assessments
Attorney General
Auditors and Audits
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Comptroller
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Correctional Institutions
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Drugs
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Fees
Governor
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Industry and Technology
Information Technology, Department of
Insurance - Health
Labeling
Legislative Policy Committee
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
Minorities
Notices
Open Government
Patients
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Privacy
Procurement
Public Health
Public Information
Publications
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
State Hospitals
State Universities and Colleges
Tax Returns
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Treasurers
Voting
Weights and Measures
Witnesses

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0768&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0768f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0768t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0768e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_88658201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_49382601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_90302501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_88727501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_46372501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_62342401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0768.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0768_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0925.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0926.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0936.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0768_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1203.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0768_62342401.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1581.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1439.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback