MD HB766 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain core service agencies, local behavioral health authorities, and local addictions authorities to approve certain funding for certain youths' educational costs incurred during admission to residential treatment centers for certain medical or psychiatric purposes; and providing that it is the intent of the General Assembly that general funds be provided in fiscal year 2025 and each fiscal year thereafter to the Maryland Department of Health to carry out certain provisions of the Act.
Title
Children – Residential Treatment Centers – Education Funding
Sponsors
Del. Anne Kaiser [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 500 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {513929/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223823/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB656 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-07 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Substance Abuse
Youth
Budgets
Children
Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Health, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Substance Abuse
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 8 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 10 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |