MD HB766 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed (114-25)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with certain entities, to undertake a technical study to review changes in forest cover and tree canopy in the State; requiring the study to include surveys and mapping and certain analyses related to forest conservation; requiring the Department to submit the study and a certain programmatic review to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 15, 2018; requiring the Department to convene a work session by November 30, 2018, to consider certain findings; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic Review

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-25) (Y: 115 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87) (Y: 47 N: 88 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (114-25)
2018-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-09HouseFloor Amendment {763724/1 (Delegate Impallaria) Rejected (46-87)
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {180018/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback