MD HB765 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that certain firefighters, rescue squad members, advance life support unit members, police officers, sheriffs, deputy sheriffs, correctional officers, and certain health care workers and child care workers, who are suffering from the effects of severe acute respiratory syndrome coronavirus 2 are presumed, under certain circumstances, to have an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty or course of employment and is compensable in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – Novel Coronavirus (Essential Workers’ Compensation Act)
Sponsors
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Airports
Chemical Tests
Child Care
Correctional Officers
Counties
COVID-19
Diseases
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Governor
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Medical Conditions
Minors
Occupational Safety
Patients
Rescue Squads
Sheriffs
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Chemical Tests
Child Care
Correctional Officers
Counties
COVID-19
Diseases
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fire Protection
Governor
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Medical Conditions
Minors
Occupational Safety
Patients
Rescue Squads
Sheriffs
Volunteers
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 9 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |