MD HB764 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain limitation on the State Lottery Fund distribution and allocating an amount equal to $27,000,000 each fiscal year to the Bus Rapid Transit Fund for bus rapid transit system grants; adding an authorized use for the Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund; requiring the Maryland Stadium Authority, by December 15, 2024, to submit to certain committees of the General Assembly a report on all public and private development activities currently under construction in the Blue Line Corridor; etc.
Title
State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-34) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {363229/1 Adopted |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-21) |
2024-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {643726/1 Adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1116 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - First Reading Senate Rules
Subjects
Appropriations
Buses
Economic Development
Gaming
Grants
Lottery
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Buses
Economic Development
Gaming
Grants
Lottery
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Railroads
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Stadium Authority
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 657.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |