MD HB761 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting insurers and nonprofit health service plans that provide coverage for prescription drugs under individual, group, or blanket health insurance policies, and health maintenance organizations that provide coverage for prescription drugs under individual or group contracts from imposing a copayment or coinsurance requirement on a covered specialty drug that exceeds a specified dollar amount; providing for an annual increase to the copayment or coinsurance requirement limit; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Specialty Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-05HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422
2014-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2014-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2014-03-31SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments {567279/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2014-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2014-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2014-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {336381/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0761&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0761f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0761t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0761e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_422_hb0761e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0761_33638101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0761_56727901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0761.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0761_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0761_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0761,h-0646&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0761,s-0817&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0761,h-1054&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback