MD HB76 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the penalties for a person convicted for possession of a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license to be a fine not exceeding $500 and an assessment of 3 points.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-2) (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 494
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (139-2)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {930117/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback