MD HB758 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a licensing and regulatory system for the practice of certified midwifery under the State Board of Nursing; requiring the Board to set standards for the practice of certified midwifery, maintain a list of all licensed certified midwives in the State, and set certain fees; altering the circumstances under which the Board shall require an applicant or a licensee to submit to a certain examination; requiring the Board to give certain persons a hearing before taking certain actions; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Licensure of Certified Midwives Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (129-7)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {434530/1 Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-22SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2021-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {676284/1 Adopted
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-05HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB684 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Passed Enrolled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations8205(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8208(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8317(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8504(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8701(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8708(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8710(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D10(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D11(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D12(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D13(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D14(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D5(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D6(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D7(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D8(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations8-6D9(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback