MD HB756 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating an exception to the general prohibition against recording or broadcasting a criminal sentencing hearing; establishing requirements that a media organization file a certain written request to provide media coverage of a criminal sentencing hearing with the clerk of the court at least 24 hours before the hearing is scheduled to begin; requiring the clerk of court to provide notice of the request to each party involved in the criminal proceeding; providing certain factors that a presiding judge may consider; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseUnfavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-25HouseHearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
2019-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback