MD HB755 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a campaign finance entity that receives a contribution in violation of a certain prohibition on contributions in the name of another person from using the contribution; requiring the campaign finance entity to remit the illegal contribution to the Fair Campaign Financing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to credit the illegal contribution to the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance – Contributions in Name of Another – Fair Campaign Financing Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-02HouseSpecial Order until 3/6 (Delegate Parrott) Adopted
2018-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {435764/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback