MD HB751 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Baltimore County Board of Education is subject to the jurisdiction of the Baltimore County Office of Inspector General; specifying the matters for which the Baltimore County Office of Inspector General may receive and investigate complaints concerning the Baltimore County Board of Education; requiring the Baltimore County Office of Inspector General to provide a report of an investigation, on request, to certain entities; etc.
Title
Baltimore County – Board of Education – Oversight by the Baltimore County Office of the Inspector General
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-10 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB655 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Baltimore County
Claims
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Fraud
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Reports
Claims
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Fraud
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Reports
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0751?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0751f.pdf |