MD HB750 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering eligibility for a specified credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on specified residential property in Baltimore County to include property owned or acquired by a cohabitant of a fallen law enforcement officer or rescue worker; altering the time period within which a disabled law enforcement officer or rescue worker, or the cohabitant or surviving spouse of a fallen officer or rescue worker, shall have acquired specified property in Baltimore County in order to qualify for the credit; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105665/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Property Tax
Rescue Squads
Residency
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Disabilities
Law Enforcement
Property Tax
Rescue Squads
Residency
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local