MD HB748 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB929
Note: Carry Over of previous HB659
Note: Carry Over of previous HB659
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the accrual rate from 2.0% to 2.5% for service earned on or after July 1, 2022, for calculating the retirement allowance for certain retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; and altering the maximum benefit that certain retirees of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System may receive, from 65% to 70% of the member's average final compensation.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB748 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m.
HB659 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
SB115 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
HB659 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
SB115 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-29 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Law Enforcement
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Retirement
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 26 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0748?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0748f.pdf |