MD HB747 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a ticket seller, except under certain circumstances, from disclosing the personal information of a purchaser to a third party; and prohibiting the personal information of a purchaser from being printed on a ticket to an entertainment event unless the purchaser is able to remove, delete, or fully obscure the personal information without invalidating the ticket.
Title
Consumer Protection - Internet Event Ticket Sales - Prohibition on Sharing Personal Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Privacy
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Privacy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |