MD HB745 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the number of early voting centers counties are required to establish; clarifying the process by which one additional early voting center may be established in a county in excess of the number of required to be established; and requiring a local board of elections, in determining the location of centers, to take into account the accessibility of centers to historically disenfranchised communities, proximity to dense concentrations of voters, accessibility by public transportation, and equitable distribution of centers in the county.
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 383225/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Floor Amendment 383225/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43 |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-14) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {413023/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {383225/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (17-30) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {693420/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-36) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {505960/1 Adopted |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2021-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Demographics
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Voting
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Demographics
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Local Government Mandates
Minorities
Records
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 10 | 301.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |