MD HB744 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the clerk of a circuit court from collecting fees for docketing the appearance of a petitioner's or a respondent's counsel in certain domestic violence cases.
Title
Courts – Counsel Appearance Fees – Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 330 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {802913/1 Adopted |
2021-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorneys
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
defendants
Domestic Violence
Fees
Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
defendants
Domestic Violence
Fees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 7 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |