MD HB744 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain modal administrations of the Department of Transportation to adopt a complete streets policy that provides information for the implementation of design features that accommodate and facilitate safe and convenient access and mobility to facilities by all users; specifying the requirements of a complete streets policy and recognizing that facilities differ and user needs should be balanced to ensure community enhancement; providing exceptions to certain requirements under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - Complete Streets Policy - Adoption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-21) (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-26) (Y: 112 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 717
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (116-21)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {377472/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-03SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (111-26)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {890016/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0744&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0744f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0744t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0744e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_717_hb0744e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0744_89001601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0744_37747201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0744.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0744_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0693.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0744_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1358.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1241.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback