MD HB743 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a simple majority of the members of the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to approve or deny an application for a per diem license in a certain formal meeting or, with a certain written voting record, through oral or written contact by any method by the chair with each member of the Board; and prohibiting the Board from requiring the publication of an application for a per diem license as a prerequisite to issuing the license.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-0) (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-0) (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 648 |
2018-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (((44-0))) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Time
Voting
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Time
Voting