MD HB742 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the dates used to determine the eligibility of members of the State Retirement and Pension System for COVID-19-related death benefits.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – COVID–19–Related Death Benefits – Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-34) |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {503623/1 Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB409 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Subjects
Beneficiaries
COVID-19
Death
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Time
COVID-19
Death
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Sunset
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2021 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |