MD HB741 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that, under the child support guidelines, if the alimony or maintenance actually paid by a payor is not deductible by the payor for federal income tax purposes, the amount of alimony or maintenance subtracted from the income of the payor under a certain provision of law is the amount of alimony or maintenance actually paid by the payor, multiplied by a certain factor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Guidelines - Treatment of Alimony Payments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback