MD HB740 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 77-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a firearm manufactured using a computer-aided fabrication device unless the firearm is imprinted with a serial number issued by a federally licensed firearms manufacturer or importer; establishing penalties of up to 5 years imprisonment or a fine of up to $5,000, or both for violations of the Act; requiring, by September 30, 2019, the Department of State Police to develop a plan for a State system for the registration of certain firearms; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Firearms – Computer–Aided Fabrication and Serial Number (3–D Printed Firearms )

Sponsors

Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]
Del. Michael Busch [D]Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Debra Davis [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]
Del. Michael Jackson [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]
Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Lesley Lopez [D]Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]
Del. David Moon [D]Del. Nick Mosby [D]Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]
Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Lily Qi [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]
Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Del. Mike Rogers [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]
Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]
Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-45) (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85) (Y: 48 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91) (Y: 42 N: 92 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (94-45)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {313527/2 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (41-91)
2019-03-16HouseFloor Amendment {123222/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-85)
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until 03/16 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {582918/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0740&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0740f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0740t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0740_58291801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0740_12322202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0740_31352702.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0000/hb0740.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0740_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0546.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0547.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0747.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback