MD HB739 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1200
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1365
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1365
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "full-time equivalent enrollment" in the calculation for State education aid to include the average number of students enrolled in kindergarten through grade 12 on September 30, December 31, March 31, and the last day of the prior school year; and applying the Act to the calculation of education funding for fiscal years beginning after June 30, 2024.
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Full-Time Equivalent Enrollment Count - Alterations (Truancy Reduction Act of 2023)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB739 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
HB1365 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
HB1365 (Carry Over) 2022-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Subjects
Primary and Secondary Education
Primary Schools
Secondary Schools
Students
Time
Truancy
Weights and Measures
Primary Schools
Secondary Schools
Students
Time
Truancy
Weights and Measures