MD HB736 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 134
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Entering the Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact; stating the purpose of the Compact; requiring that a state meet certain requirements to participate in the Compact; establishing duties of member states; authorizing a certain state to charge a certain fee for granting a certain privilege; requiring certain professional counselors to meet certain eligibility requirements to receive certain licensure and exercise a certain privilege; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interstate Licensed Professional Counselors Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-16SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2021-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments {996286/1 Adopted
2021-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-02-02HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB571 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135

Subjects

Administrative Agencies
Armed Forces
Assessments
Attorneys
Biometrics
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Continuing Education
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Curriculum
Data
Discipline
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Ethics
Examinations
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Identification
Industry and Technology
internet
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Medical Research
Medical Treatments
meetings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Open Government
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Procurement
Public Information
Public Officials
Real Property
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Virtual Environments
Voting
Work, Labor, and Employment

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations176B-01(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback