MD HB732 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Revising the schedule of basic child support obligations used to calculate the amount of a child support award under the child support guidelines; authorizing a court, in determining whether the application of the child support guidelines would be unjust or inappropriate in a particular case, to consider whether an obligor's monthly obligation would leave the obligor with a monthly actual income below the 2019 federal poverty level for an individual; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Guidelines - Revision

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-2)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback