MD HB732 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Applying specified provisions of law relating to employees of a motor vehicle rental company that holds a specified limited lines license to authorized representatives of the motor vehicle rental company; requiring a motor vehicle rental company that holds a specified limited lines license to maintain a specified register and to make the register available for inspection by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner as the Commissioner requires; etc.
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {773493/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Contractors
Discipline
Disclosure
Fines
Inspections
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Restitution
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Discipline
Disclosure
Fines
Inspections
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Job Training
Leases and Rent
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Restitution
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment