MD HB730 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to extend the period of time that an identification card remains effective by 90 days under certain circumstances; altering the documentation that applicants for a learner's permit who are under the age of 16 years are required to present to the Administration; altering the time period before expiration within which a driver's license is renewable; altering the standards for determining whether an individual is required to appear in person to renew the individual's driver's license; etc.
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB569 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-10 - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Subjects
Driver Education
Drivers' Licenses
Examinations
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Photography
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Drivers' Licenses
Examinations
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Photography
Time
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 12 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 16 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |