MD HB727 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, on or before July 1, 2020, the Prince George's County government and the Prince George's County Board of Education to have a public-private partnership agreement in which the county government and the board of education contracts with a private entity for certain public school construction reviewed by the Maryland Stadium Authority and approved by the Interagency Committee on School Construction; establishing the Prince George's County Public-Private Partnership Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Build to Learn Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 134 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (133-3)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseSpecial Order until 03/16 (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {664662/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback