MD HB722 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 1:30 pm House Health and Government Operations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to contract with an independent consultant to conduct a review of the "Business Disparities in the Maryland Market Area" study completed on February 8, 2017 to evaluate, on or before October 1, 2021, whether the data in the study demonstrates a compelling interest to implement certain remedial measures specifically to assist African American-owned businesses; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procurement - Disparity Studies - African American-Owned Businesses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-12HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback