MD HB717 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring in Howard County the Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board, on determining whether to approve an application for a new Class A license, regardless of kind, to include specified findings in its written decision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Licenses - Findings Ho. Co. 7-10

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-13 Approved by the Governor
2010-04-03 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2010-04-02 Second Reading Passed
2010-04-02 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-06 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-03-26 Hearing 4/2 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-23 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2010-04-01 Returned Passed
2010-03-20 Third Reading Passed (136-0)
2010-03-18 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-18 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-03-17 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2010-02-09 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-05 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback