MD HB713 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Hearing: Feb 25 @ 1:00 pm House Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Personnel Services and Benefits within the Department of Budget and Management to study the number and salaries of certain employees employed by certain State agencies in a position of grade 19 or above who are African American, Hispanic, or any other racial minority and report its findings to the Governor and a certain committee of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2020, and June 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2020-02-21HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-31HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-30HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback