MD HB713 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an individual otherwise qualified for jury service living outside the United States be excused by a jury judge or jury commissioner from jury service for a certain period after submitting a certain affidavit under penalty of perjury stating the individual's foreign address, intended date of return to the United States, or that the individual has no determined date of return; and requiring a jury judge to summon the individual for jury service after a certain date or no earlier than 5 years after receipt of a certain affidavit; etc.
Title
Jury Duty - Individuals Qualified for Jury Service Living Outside the United States
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-10) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-10) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {752818/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 11:00 a.m. |
2019-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |