MD HB712 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-05 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Baltimore County to issue on request of a secured party a certificate of vacancy or a certificate of property unfit for human habitation for purposes of filing an order to docket or complaint to foreclose on residential property; and requiring that a certificate be issued or denied in Baltimore County within 14 days after the date of the request for the certificate.
Title
Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-31 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2016-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {900718/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |