MD HB71 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB478

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a school vehicle driver to pass an appropriate medical examination before employment and once during each 2 years of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor Vehicles - School Vehicle Drivers - Medical Examinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2023-03-16SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-03-03SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2023-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2023-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2023-02-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2023-01-19HouseHearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-11HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2022-11-18HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB71 (Carry Over) 2023-04-10 - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Transportation16816(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback