MD HB71 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB251
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act to require the Department of Budget and Management to include in a searchable website payments made by units of State government that receive funds that are not appropriated in the annual budget bill; requiring the Department to update the payment data on the searchable website on or before the 15th day of the month that follows the month in which an agency makes a payment to a payee; etc.
Title
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Steve Johnson [D] | Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {304365/1 Adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB71 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
internet
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Data
Disclosure
Ethics
internet
Operating Budget
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |