MD HB709 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-27 - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring pharmacy benefits managers to file with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, beginning January 1, 2022, and every 3 months thereafter, a certain report of all drugs appearing on the National Average Drug Acquisition Cost list that were reimbursed during a certain period at an amount below a certain cost plus a certain fee; requiring that the report be made available to the public by the Commissioner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB614 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-31 - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General15102.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance151612(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback