MD HB701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from noon to 11 a.m., the starting time on Sunday for the sale of alcoholic beverages for a holder of a Class A beer license, a Class A beer and light wine license, or a Class A beer, wine, and liquor license in Washington County for certain purposes.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Hours of Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-1) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Blue Laws
Commerce and Business
Retail Sales
Time
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Blue Laws
Commerce and Business
Retail Sales
Time
Washington County