MD HB700 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from committing certain acts against a group because of the group's race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, or national origin, or because the group is homeless.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Group Victim

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (131-6)
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback