MD HB698 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a vehicle manufacturer from recovering by certain means all or a portion of its costs for compensating a vehicle dealer for vehicle preparation and delivery or warranty or recall repairs by arbitrarily reducing the amount of the compensation that is due to the dealer, or imposing a separate charge, surcharge, or other burden; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and Dealers - Compensation for Dealer Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-2) (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-19) (Y: 116 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (43-2)
2019-04-08SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {318570/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (115-19)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback