MD HB697 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission to establish a workgroup to carry out the finding and declaration of the General Assembly that it is in the public interest to ensure that the health care protections established by the federal Affordable Care Act continue to protect Maryland residents in light of continued threats to the federal Affordable Care Act; requiring the workgroup to monitor certain court cases and the enforcement of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance – Consumer Protections and Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission

Sponsors

Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Heather Bagnall [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Regina Boyce [D]
Del. Talmadge Branch [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Michael Busch [D]
Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Mark Chang [D]
Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Charlotte Crutchfield [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Debra Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]
Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Andrea Harrison [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]
Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]
Del. Sara Love [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Emily Shetty [D]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]
Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Vaughn Stewart [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]
Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Geraldine Valentino-Smith [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]
Del. Ron Watson [D]Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]

Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418
2019-03-29HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (45-2)
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-6)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {716486/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback