MD HB695 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the board of directors or other governing body of a homeowners association to prepare and submit an annual proposed budget to the lot owners at least 30 days before its adoption; authorizing a specified budget and notice of meeting to sent to lot owners by specified means; requiring the budget to include specified items; requiring the budget to be adopted at an open meeting of the homeowners association or specified other body; etc.
Title
Homeowners Association - Annual Budget - Notice, Information, and Adoption
Sponsors
Del. Sue Hecht [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Special Order 4/5 (Senator Lenett) Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Environmental Matters |