MD HB693 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified agency or organization to be approved by 2-1-1 Maryland in order to provide 2-1-1 services in the State; providing that 2-1-1 Maryland may approve no more than five call centers to provide 2-1-1 services in the State; requiring 2-1-1 Maryland to consider specified criteria when approving a 2-1-1 service provider; requiring specified units of the State to consult with 2-1-1 Maryland under specified circumstances; altering the membership of the Health and Human Services Referral Board; etc.
Title
Health and Human Services Referral Board - 2-1-1 Maryland - Modifications
Sponsors
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Hubbard [D] | Del. Sue Kullen [D] |
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Steven Schuh [R] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-04 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Emergencies
Health
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Information
Social Services
Telephones
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Counties
Emergencies
Health
Montgomery County
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Information
Social Services
Telephones