MD HB69 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a restriction that prohibits specified gaming licensees in Dorchester County from holding gaming events or carnivals on a Sunday.
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-3) (Y: 130 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-3) |
2013-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-20 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-21 | House | Reassigned to Ways and Means |
2013-01-11 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |