MD HB689 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each community college to ensure all student advisors are trained on the unique needs and resources available for students who are veterans, to employ at least one employee who, as a component of the employee's job duties and responsibilities, provides certain enrollment and advising services to current and prospective students who are veterans, and to establish a veterans resource center on the community college campus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colonel Todd J. Hixson Memorial Resource Center Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474
2018-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-07SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-06HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-02HouseFloor Amendment {583327/1 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted
2018-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {415169/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0689&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0689f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0689t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_474_hb0689t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0689_41516901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0689_58332701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0689.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0689_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0222.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0689_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1074.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback