MD HB684 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the criteria for a county board of education to be eligible to receive supplemental prekindergarten State grants in fiscal years 2018 through 2020; making specified grants to Baltimore City Public Schools subject to Baltimore City providing specified local contributions; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to make specified disbursements; requiring a specified audit; requiring the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners to develop a specified financial recovery plan; etc.
Title
Education - State Grants for Education Aid
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-8) (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-13) (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (124-13) (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6 |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-8) |
2017-03-28 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {849838/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-13) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {683321/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {784664/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Grants
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
Auditors and Audits
Baltimore City
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Grants
Kent County
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports