MD HB681 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB339
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to examine the composition and purpose of the orphans' courts in Maryland and make recommendations about how to improve the orphans' courts in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-14) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {442316/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-26 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-26 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB339 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Associations
Attorneys
Communications
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Estates and Trusts
General Assembly
Governor
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Jurisdiction
Orphans' Court
Registers of Wills
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Associations
Attorneys
Communications
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Estates and Trusts
General Assembly
Governor
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Jurisdiction
Orphans' Court
Registers of Wills
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment