MD HB681 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "school vehicle"; establishing that a school vehicle includes specified vehicles that meet or comply with specified standards and requirements, were originally used to transport children, students, and teachers in another state, and are used only for transporting children to and from a Head Start program.
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Vehicles - Definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-6) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Child Care
Education
Interstate Affairs
Minors
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
School Buses
Students
Teachers
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Education
Interstate Affairs
Minors
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
Primary and Secondary Education
School Buses
Students
Teachers
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous