MD HB68 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of the State's Attorney for Baltimore City to establish a Diversionary and Reentry Program in Baltimore City for at-risk youth and youth offenders; requiring the Office of the State's Attorney for Prince George's County to establish a Diversionary and Reentry Program in Prince George's County for at-risk youth and youth offenders; establishing that the purposes of the programs are to improve public safety, develop skills for at-risk youth, and reduce recidivism by youth offenders; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseHearing canceled
2021-02-10HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-26HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-15HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-10-27HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB115 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services9247(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback